U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01924-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crawford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 05, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.