U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03366
  • Case Name: Galeas v. Gibson et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.