U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00474-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leary
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Sent]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Rule 5 Bond Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 12, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.