U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01942-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mattison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.