U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01945-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dockery
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • October 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.