U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01943-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharp
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 12, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 06, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.