U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKay
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Bond ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.