U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mc-00024
  • Case Name: AR Textiles Ltd. v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response]
  • October 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 12, 2022: [Withdraw Reference]
  • October 12, 2022: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.