U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02171
  • Case Name: Speight-Bey v. United States Parole Commissioner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Writ of Mandamus]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Writ of Mandamus]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 24, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 21, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 21, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.