U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03371
  • Case Name: Battle v. Butner F.M.C. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 22, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 22, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 22, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA PLRA Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 28, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • November 28, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 16, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.