U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02173
  • Case Name: Jordan v. State of North Carolina et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 18, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 13, 2022: [Document]
  • October 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.