U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03378
  • Case Name: Granado v. Ishee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 23, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 17, 2022: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 17, 2022: [Declaration]
  • November 10, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.