U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03379
  • Case Name: Steepleton v. Avery et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 10, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.