U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 30, 2022: [Information - Petty before USMJ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.