U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abney
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 18, 2023: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 13, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.