U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01977-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrano
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2022: [Document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.