U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01972-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ford
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Show Cause Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 26, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.