U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01971-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 28, 2022: [Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.