U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01968-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.