U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01966-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adepegba
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 26, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.