U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01985-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dearborn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 21, 2022: [Text Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.