U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.