U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01213-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reynolds
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 19, 2025: [Order]
  • May 16, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • May 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Sealed Amended Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
  • May 15, 2025: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Arrest ]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 01, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 26, 2022: [Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 19, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.