U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03382
  • Case Name: Berry v. United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 20, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 20, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 08, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 04, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • November 04, 2022: [Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Document]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.