U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02176
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Dejanovich
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Remark]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice-other]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • November 02, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • November 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • November 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Certificate of a Sexually Dangerous Person]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.