U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02179
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • December 23, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • December 09, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Respondent's Mental Health Examiner]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 21, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.