U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Document]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 04, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.