U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ziolkowski
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment in a Petty Offense Case]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.