U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03387
  • Case Name: Richmond v. Hicks et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 24, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 24, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.