U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03385
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Young
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 17, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.