U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01976-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea and Sentence ]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 25, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.