U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02180
  • Case Name: Williams v. McMahon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2022: [Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.