U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02182
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice-other]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 01, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • October 26, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.