U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03388
  • Case Name: Hundley v. White et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Directing Return of Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.