U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03390
  • Case Name: Ward v. Pellini
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Document]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • November 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.