U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Penderman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Document]
  • December 01, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 01, 2022: [Information - Petty before USMJ]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.