U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02183
  • Case Name: United States of America v. McAfee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Withdraw]
  • January 11, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.