U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 18, 2022: [Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.