U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sturdivant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.