U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03397
  • Case Name: France v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 02, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.