U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soler
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.