U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03399
  • Case Name: Stewart v. Everette
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.