U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDowell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • November 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.