U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03401
  • Case Name: Harrell v. Hayes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 04, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.