U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03402
  • Case Name: McGriff El v. Small Claims Court et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.