U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • November 10, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.