U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Innab
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.