U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03405
  • Case Name: Anderson et al v. Grande et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.