U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03409
  • Case Name: Ragland v. Vance County et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.