U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03407
  • Case Name: Morrison v. Evans et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 19, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • May 19, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.